RI S2829 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- ELECTRIC BICYCLES - Defines 3 classes of electric bicycles, authorizes the DEM to determine allowable uses of electric bicycles at properties under the department's jurisdiction, allows Class 1 electric bicycles to legally access state bicycle trails or paths.
Title
Defines 3 classes of electric bicycles, authorizes the DEM to determine allowable uses of electric bicycles at properties under the department's jurisdiction, allows Class 1 electric bicycles to legally access state bicycle trails or paths.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-06 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2024) |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |