RI S2872 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an advisory council to review locally administered pension funds.
Title
Retirement Security Act For Locally Administered Pension Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee heard |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |