RI S2888 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- AUTOMATED DECISION TOOLS - Requires companies that develop or deploy high-risk AI systems to conduct impact assessments and adopt risk management programs, would apply to both developers and deployers of AI systems with different obligations based on their role in AI ecosystem.
Title
Requires companies that develop or deploy high-risk AI systems to conduct impact assessments and adopt risk management programs, would apply to both developers and deployers of AI systems with different obligations based on their role in AI ecosystem.
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Victoria Gu [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Commercial Law
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- AUTOMATED DECISION TOOLS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- AUTOMATED DECISION TOOLS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2888.pdf |