RI S2928 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow John M. Kelly to join Charles Robert Mallery and Wallace Raymond Demary, Jr., in marriage on or about August 16, 2014, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2014) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |