RI S2928 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Christopher Edward Buonanno to join Nancy Ann Thibault and Donnell Edward Smith in marriage on or about July 30, 2016, within the City of Cranston, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-05-24 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-05-20 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/10/2016) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2016) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |