RI S2929 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - Senate held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the taking of domesticated and undomesticated game birds on a shooting preserve subject to certain requirements on licensing, shooting area and records required to be kept.
Title
Field Trials And Shooting Preserves
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | Senate held on desk |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |