RI S2947 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a uniform election day for all local and special elections.
Title
Scheduling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2018) |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |