RI S3005 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing The Town Of Coventry To Finance Renovations, Improvements And Equipping Of The Athletic Complex At Coventry High School By The Issuance Of Not More Than $1,000,000 Bonds, Notes And/or Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Therefor
Title
An Act Authorizing The Town Of Coventry To Finance Renovations, Improvements And Equipping Of The Athletic Complex At Coventry High School By The Issuance Of Not More Than $1,000,000 Bonds, Notes And/or Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Therefor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-11 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2012) | |
2012-06-07 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S3005.pdf |