RI S3023 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- OPTIONAL RETIREMENT FOR MEMBERS OF POLICE FORCE AND FIREFIGHTERS - Provides an option for members to receive retirement allowances, without reduction, upon reaching twenty-five (25) years of total service or after twenty (20) years of service upon reaching age fifty-seven (57).
Title
Provides an option for members to receive retirement allowances, without reduction, upon reaching twenty-five (25) years of total service or after twenty (20) years of service upon reaching age fifty-seven (57).
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Towns And Cities
TOWNS AND CITIES -- OPTIONAL RETIREMENT FOR MEMBERS OF POLICE FORCE AND FIREFIGHTERS
TOWNS AND CITIES -- OPTIONAL RETIREMENT FOR MEMBERS OF POLICE FORCE AND FIREFIGHTERS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S3023.pdf |