RI S3069 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES -- RETAIL LICENSES - Allows for the issuance of a Class B or BV liquor license for the property located at 79 Ives Street in the city of Providence.
Title
Allows for the issuance of a Class B or BV liquor license for the property located at 79 Ives Street in the city of Providence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-04 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-30 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-24 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2024) |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2024) |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |