RI S3083 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Motor Fuel Tax (this Resolution Creates An Eight Member Study Commission To Study And Make Recommendations On The Elimination Of The Motor Fuel Tax And Who Would Report Back By March 1, 2015, And Expire On May 1, 2015.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Motor Fuel Tax (this Resolution Creates An Eight Member Study Commission To Study And Make Recommendations On The Elimination Of The Motor Fuel Tax And Who Would Report Back By March 1, 2015, And Expire On May 1, 2015.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |