SC H3146 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND CHAPTER 41, TITLE 2, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE JOINT COMMITTEE ON TAXATION, SO AS TO REPLACE THAT COMMITTEE WITH THE TAX STUDY COMMISSION AND PROVIDE FOR ITS MEMBERSHIP AND DUTIES, TO PROVIDE THAT THE FIRST ORDER OF BUSINESS OF THIS TAX STUDY COMMISSION IS A REVIEW OF STATE SALES AND USE TAX EXEMPTIONS WHICH MUST BE SUBMITTED TO THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY AND THE GOVERNOR BEFORE THE BEGINNING OF THE 2010 SESSION OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY, TO REQUIRE THAT REVIEW TO CONTAIN SPECIFIC RECOMMENDATIONS WITH RESPECT TO EXEMPTIONS TO BE ELIMINATED OR REVISED AND A REDUCED STATE SALES AND USE TAX RATE TO PROVIDE REVENUE NEUTRALITY, TO PROVIDE FOR THE REPORTING AND IMPLEMENTATION OF THE COMMITTEE'S RECOMMENDATIONS AND AMENDMENTS ALLOWED TO THESE RECOMMENDATIONS AND THE MANNER IN WHICH THEY TAKE EFFECT; AND TO REPEAL CHAPTER 41 OF TITLE 2 ESTABLISHING THE TAX STUDY COMMISSION EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2011, UNLESS THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY BY LAW EXTENDS THE COMMISSION'S EXISTENCE.
Title
Replace That Committee With The Tax Study Commission And Provide For Its Membership And Duties, To Provide That The First Order Of Business Of This Tax Study Commission Is A Review Of State Sales And Use Tax Exemptions Which Must Be Submitted To The General Assembly And The Governor Before The Beginning Of The 2010 Session Of The General Assembly, To Require That Review To Contain Specific Recommendations With Respect To Exemptions To Be Eliminated Or Revised And A Reduced State Sales And Use Tax Rate To Provide Revenue Neutrality, To Provide For The Reporting And Implementation Of The Committee's Recommendations And Amendments Allowed To These Recommendations And The Manner In Which They Take Effect; And To Repeal Chapter 41 Of Title 2 Establishing The Tax Study Commission Effective July 1, 2011, Unless The General Assembly By Law Extends The Commission's Existence.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Agnew [D] | Rep. Nathan Ballentine [R] | Rep. James Battle [D] | Rep. James Harrison [R] |
Rep. Edward Pitts [R] | Rep. James Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-29 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine | |
2009-01-28 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: E.H.Pitts | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-65 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-64 | |
2008-12-16 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2008-12-16 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3278 (Similar To) 2009-02-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Horne
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3146&session=118 |