SC H3174 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act No. 114
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act No. 114
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 56-1-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Certain Terms And Their Definitions Associated With The Powers And Duties Of The Department Of Motor Vehicles, So As To Provide Definitions For The Terms "electric-assist Bicycles" And "bicycles With Helper Motors"; And By Adding Section 56-5-3520 So As To Provide That Bicyclists Operating Bicycles With Helper Motors Are Subject To All Statutory Provisions Applicable To Bicyclists. - Ratified Title
Title
Bicycles, electric-assisted
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Act No. 114 | |
2020-02-05 | Effective date 02/03/20 | |
2020-02-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-01-29 | Ratified R 116 | |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2020-01-15 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2020-01-15 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2019-05-09 | House | Debate adjourned on amendments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2019-04-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-1 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Amended |
2019-04-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning, Hixon |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |