SC H3228 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide The Department Of Employment And Workforce Shall Screen An Applicant For Unemployment Benefits Using The E-verify Program.
Title
Department of Employment and Workforce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy | |
2011-02-08 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson | |
2011-02-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons | |
2011-01-27 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson, Owens, Simrill | |
2011-01-25 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bikas | |
2011-01-12 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-14 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2010-12-14 | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3228&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/3228_20101214.htm |