SC H3269 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Statewide Advisory Referendum Must Be Conducted By The State Election Commission At The Same Time As The 2022 General Election On The Question Of Whether South Carolina Should Participate In Medicaid Expansion.
Title
Medicaid expansion
Sponsors
Rep. Kambrell Garvin [D] | Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] | Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. Thomas Brittain [R] |
Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley |
2021-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brittain |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0083 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3269&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3269_20201209.htm |