SC H3415 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Define Necessary Terms, To Prohibit The Use Of Drones By A Law Enforcement Agency To Gather Evidence Or Other Information Without A Search Warrant, To Provide Exceptions To The Prohibition, To Allow An Aggrieved Party To Bring A Civil Action Against A Law Enforcement Agency For A Violation, And To Provide Evidence Or Information Obtained In Violation Of The Statute Cannot Be Used In A Criminal Prosecution In This State.
Title
Freedom From Unwarranted Surveillance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kristopher Crawford [R] | Rep. Eric Bedingfield [R] | Rep. Todd Atwater [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] |
Rep. Phyllis Henderson [R] | Rep. Wendy Nanney [R] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Rep. Joshua Putnam [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3514 (Similar To) 2014-01-31 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hembree (ch), Allen, Thurmond
S0395 (Similar To) 2013-02-19 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0395 (Similar To) 2013-02-19 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3415&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3415_20130124.htm |