SC H3433 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Add The Subject Of Domestic Violence Beginning With The 2016-2017 School Year; And To Strike The Word "criminal" From References To Criminal Domestic Violence Offenses Throughout As Appropriate.
Title
Domestic Violence Reform Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 22 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Recede (Y: 30 N: 72 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 36 N: 75 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Recede (Y: 30 N: 72 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 36 N: 75 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-6 |
2015-04-16 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-16-15 |
2015-04-16 | House | Amended |
2015-04-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-9 |
2015-04-14 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-14 | House | Amended |
2015-04-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.J.McLeod |
2015-03-26 | House | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Erickson, Cobb-Hunter, Douglas, Crosby, Daning, Bales, Anthony, Long, Herbkersman, Jefferson, WJ McLeod, Yow, Whitmire, Sandifer, Golfinch, Anderson, Loftis, HA Crawford, Hart, Finlay, King, McEachern, Putnam, Gagnon, McKnight, Mitchell, Hosey, Clyburn, RL Brown, Tallon, Allison, Forrester, Gilliard, Corley, Clary, Sottile, Mack, Hicks, Chumly, Kennedy, Spires, Nanney, Weeks, Funderburk, Powers-Norrell, Robinson-Simpson, Dilliard, VS Moss, GR Smith, Knight |
2015-03-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight, Sandifer, Gilliard, R.L.Brown, Whipper |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk, Norrell |
2015-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell |
2015-02-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, J.E.Smith, King, Howard, Parks, Ott, Jefferson, Bernstein, Rivers, Southard, Tinkler, Henegan, Kirby, Bales, Neal, Henderson, Herbkersman, Merrill, G.R.Smith, Bradley, Bannister, H.A.Crawford, Newton, Clemmons, Nanney, Wells, Quinn, Whitmire, Bingham, Stringer, Atwater, Hicks |
2015-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0003 (Similar To) 2015-06-12 - Act No. 58
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 15 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 15 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 15 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 15 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 25 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 3 | 546 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 5 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 5 | 530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 1 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 32 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |