SC S0003 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Act No. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Act No. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Include First Offense Convictions For Domestic Violence In The Third Degree In The Purview Of The Statute After Five Years From The Date Of Conviction
Title
Criminal Domestic Violence Offenses and Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Martin [R] | Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] | Sen. Gerald Malloy [D] | Sen. John Courson [R] |
Sen. Michael Fair [R] | Sen. Ross Turner [R] | Sen. Joel Lourie [D] | Sen. Greg Hembree [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 81 N: 23 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | Act No. 58 | |
2015-06-11 | Effective date 06/04/15 | |
2015-06-04 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-06-02 | Ratified R 80 | |
2015-05-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-23 |
2015-05-28 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2015-05-21 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2015-05-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2015-05-20 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-20 | House | Amended |
2015-05-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-14 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-3 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-01-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hembree (ch), Allen, McElveen, Shealy, Turner |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3433 (Similar To) 2015-04-21 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 15 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 15 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 15 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 15 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 22 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 25 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 5 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 5 | 910 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
43 | 1 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 7 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 32 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |