SC H3550 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - Act No. 46
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - Act No. 46
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND CHAPTER 10, TITLE 6, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE BUILDING ENERGY EFFICIENCY STANDARD ACT, SO AS TO REVISE THE TITLE OF THE ACT TO THE "ENERGY STANDARD ACT"; TO REVISE DEFINITIONS; TO ADOPT THE 2006 EDITION INTERNATIONAL ENERGY CONSERVATION CODE AS THE ENERGY STANDARD AND TO PROVIDE THAT ALL NEW AND RENOVATED BUILDINGS AND ADDITIONS MUST COMPLY WITH THIS STANDARD, TO PROVIDE THAT LOCAL BUILDING OFFICIALS SHALL ENFORCE THE ENERGY STANDARD AND TO PROVIDE ALTERNATIVE ENFORCERS IN AREAS WITHOUT A BUILDING OFFICIAL; TO PROVIDE THAT BUILDING OFFICIALS SHALL ISSUE AND REVOKE BUILDING PERMITS AND INSPECT CONSTRUCTION OF BUILDINGS PURSUANT TO THE PERMITS ISSUED, TO REQUIRE LOCAL JURISDICTIONS TO PROVIDE AN APPEALS BOARD AND PROCESS FOR GRANTING OF CERTAIN VARIANCES, TO PROVIDE AN EXCEPTION, AND TO ALLOW CERTAIN APPEALS TO BE HEARD BY THE SOUTH CAROLINA BUILDING CODES COUNCIL; AND TO PROVIDE THAT THE BUILDING OFFICIAL MAY OBTAIN INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; AND TO AMEND SECTION 6-9-50, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE MANDATORY ADOPTION OF CERTAIN NATIONAL BUILDING CODES, BUILDING ENVELOPE REQUIREMENTS OF THE ENERGY CODE, FREE ACCESS TO CODE DOCUMENTS, AND THREE STORY HOMES, SO AS TO DELETE PROVISIONS RELATING TO WHAT CONSTITUTES COMPLIANCE WITH THE BUILDING ENVELOPE REQUIREMENTS OF THE ENERGY CODE, FREE ACCESS TO DOCUMENTS CONTAINING CODES ADOPTED BY THE BUILDING CODES COUNCIL, AND BUILDING PERMITS FOR THREE STORY HOMES. - ratified title
Title
Delete Provisions Relating To What Constitutes Compliance With The Building Envelope Requirements Of The Energy Code, Free Access To Documents Containing Codes Adopted By The Building Codes Council, And Building Permits For Three Story Homes. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-12 | Act No. 46 | |
2009-06-11 | Effective date 07/01/09 | |
2009-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Ratified R 105 | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-22 | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time SJ-17 | |
2009-05-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry SJ-16 | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry SJ-15 | |
2009-04-30 | Introduced and read first time SJ-15 | |
2009-04-29 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-19 | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time HJ-24 | |
2009-04-28 | Amended HJ-21 | |
2009-04-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-04-23 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-3 | |
2009-04-22 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson | |
2009-02-26 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile | |
2009-02-24 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Allison, Parker | |
2009-02-18 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hutto | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-25 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced and read first time HJ-24 |
Same As/Similar To
S0719 (Similar To) 2009-04-15 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry SJ-6
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3550&session=118 |