SC H3578 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stringer
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stringer
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-26-120 So As To Provide The State Department Of Education Shall Provide Certain Educator Preparation Programs With Certain Information Regarding Graduates Of Those Programs, To Provide Educator Preparation Programs May Not Share Identifiable Educator Data With Third Parties Without Written Consent, And To Provide This Information Is Not Subject To The Freedom Of Information Act.
Title
Educator preparation programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stringer |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3577 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
H4758 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Education
H4758 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Education
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3578&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3578_20190115.htm |