SC H3614 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION PROPOSING AN AMENDMENT TO SECTION 7, ARTICLE VI, CONSTITUTION OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1895, RELATING TO THE CONSTITUTIONAL OFFICERS OF THIS STATE, SO AS TO DELETE THE ADJUTANT GENERAL, COMMISSIONER OF AGRICULTURE, SECRETARY OF STATE, AND SUPERINTENDENT OF EDUCATION FROM THE LIST OF STATE OFFICERS WHICH THE CONSTITUTION REQUIRES TO BE ELECTED AND PROVIDE THAT UPON THE EXPIRATION OF THE TERMS OF THESE OFFICERS SERVING IN OFFICE ON THE DATE OF THE RATIFICATION OF THIS PROVISION, THEY MUST BE APPOINTED BY THE GOVERNOR, UPON THE ADVICE AND CONSENT OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY, TO SERVE AT HIS PLEASURE AND TO BE REMOVABLE BY HIM FOR ANY REASON; PROPOSING AN AMENDMENT TO SECTION 4, ARTICLE XIII, RELATING TO THE ADJUTANT GENERAL AND HIS STAFF OFFICERS, SO AS TO UPDATE REFERENCES TO HIS TITLE AND MILITARY RANK, AND TO PROVIDE THAT UPON THE EXPIRATION OF THE TERM OF THE ADJUTANT GENERAL SERVING IN OFFICE ON THE DATE OF THE RATIFICATION OF THIS PROVISION, HE MUST BE APPOINTED BY THE GOVERNOR IN THE MANNER REQUIRED BY SECTION 7, ARTICLE VI; AND PROPOSING AN AMENDMENT TO SECTION 8, ARTICLE IV, RELATING TO THE ELECTION, QUALIFICATIONS, AND TERM OF THE LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR, SO AS TO PROVIDE FOR THE JOINT ELECTION OF GOVERNOR AND LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR BEGINNING WITH THE GENERAL ELECTION OF 2014.
Title
Provide For The Joint Election Of Governor And Lieutenant Governor Beginning With The General Election Of 2014.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Harrell [R] | Rep. Nikki Randhawa Haley [R] | Rep. Timothy Scott [R] | Rep. Mark Willis [R] |
Sen. Thomas Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis | |
2010-02-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haley | |
2010-01-28 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: T.R.Young, Scott | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-6 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced and read first time HJ-6 |
Same As/Similar To
H3275 (Similar To) 2009-02-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Horne
H3279 (Similar To) 2010-01-27 - Roll call Yeas-82 Nays-34 HJ-26
H4475 (Similar To) 2010-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-4
H3279 (Similar To) 2010-01-27 - Roll call Yeas-82 Nays-34 HJ-26
H4475 (Similar To) 2010-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-4
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3614&session=118 |