SC H3707 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopt Policies That Preserve Environmental Quality Under The Clean Air Act While Refusing To Implement A Clean Power State Implementation Plan Before A Clean Air Act Section 111(d) Regulation Undergoing Full And Complete Judicial Review, And The Public Service Commission Shall Cap Rate Increases Associated With Greenhouse Gas Regulations At One And One-half Percent.
Title
Clean Air Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-03-04 | House | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3570 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry