SC H3707 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Make Appropriations For The State's Public Health Response To The Covid-19 Virus, Including Vaccinations, And To Further Provide For The Response To The Covid-19 Virus. - Ratified Title
Title
COVID-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 5 (Y: 23 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 4 (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 5 (Y: 23 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment Number 4 (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Act No. 2 | |
2021-02-24 | Effective date 02/19/21 | |
2021-02-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-02-18 | Ratified R 4 | |
2021-02-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2021-02-16 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2021-02-16 | House | Amendment 1A Tabled |
2021-02-11 | House | Debate adjourned on Senate amendments until Tues., 2-16-21 |
2021-02-11 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2021-02-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-01-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-01-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-116 Nays-1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Amended |
2021-01-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |