SC H3789 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Act No. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Act No. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Include A Reference To The Director Of The South Carolina Youth Challenge Academy Attesting To The Eligibility Of The Charge For Expungement On An Expungement Application
Title
SC Youth Challenge Academy and SC Jobs Challenge Program Expungement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Motion To Waive The Printing Rule (Y: 5 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Motion To Waive The Printing Rule (Y: 5 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Act No. 262 | |
2018-07-05 | Effective date 07/02/18 | |
2018-07-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-06-29 | Ratified R 292 | |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2018-06-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2018-06-27 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Campsen, Young, Scott |
2018-04-03 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Pope, Murphy, Weeks |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2017-05-10 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Malloy, Shealy, Rice, Timmons |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-03-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper, Brown |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0451 (Similar To) 2017-03-31 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Malloy, Shealy, Rice, Timmons