SC H3887 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 11-27-110, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO SUBJECTING A LEASE PURCHASE OR FINANCING AGREEMENT TO A CONSTITUTIONAL DEBT LIMIT, SO AS TO PROVIDE A SCHOOL DISTRICT WITH AN AVERAGE DAILY MEMBERSHIP OF SIXTY-FIVE HUNDRED STUDENTS OR LESS MAY ENTER CERTAIN FINANCING AGREEMENTS THROUGH DECEMBER 31, 2012.
Title
Provide A School District With An Average Daily Membership Of Sixty-five Hundred Students Or Less May Enter Certain Financing Agreements Through December 31, 2012.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-124 | |
2009-04-02 | Introduced and read first time HJ-123 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3887&session=118 |