SC H3938 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 7, Title 6, Entitled The "south Carolina Inclusionary Housing Act" So As To Provide That Counties And Municipalities Are Authorized To Adopt And Use Voluntary Inclusionary Housing Strategies To Increase The Availability Of Affordable Housing.
Title
SC Inclusionary Housing Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Continued |
2022-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers |
2022-03-30 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams |
2022-03-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-22-22 |
2022-02-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McDaniel |
2022-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: K.O.Johnson, Dillard |
2022-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2022-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Murray |
2022-01-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-01-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan, Govan, Henderson-Myers |
2022-01-26 | House | Committee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-05-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |