SC H3975 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Veto sustained Yeas-1 Nays-104 HJ-39
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Veto sustained Yeas-1 Nays-104 HJ-39
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND SECTION 50-9-320, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE REQUIREMENT THAT CERTAIN PERSONS SUCCESSFULLY MUST COMPLETE A HUNTER'S EDUCATION PROGRAM BEFORE THEY ARE ELIGIBLE TO RECEIVE A SOUTH CAROLINA HUNTING LICENSE, SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT THIS REQUIREMENT DOES NOT APPLY TO NONRESIDENT ACTIVE DUTY, HONORABLY DISCHARGED OR RETIRED MEMBERS OF THE UNITED STATES ARMED SERVICES WHO CAN DEMONSTRATE TO THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES THAT THEY SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETED RIFLE MARKSMANSHIP DURING THEIR MILITARY CAREER; AND TO PROVIDE THAT A NONRESIDENT DURING A SPECIFIED PERIOD MAY OBTAIN A LIFETIME COMBINATION LICENSE UNDER CERTAIN CONDITIONS WHICH GRANTS THE SAME PRIVILEGES AS A STATEWIDE COMBINATION LICENSE. - ratified title
Title
Provide That This Requirement Does Not Apply To Nonresident Active Duty, Honorably Discharged Or Retired Members Of The United States Armed Services Who Can Demonstrate To The Department Of Natural Resources That They Successfully Completed Rifle Marksmanship During Their Military Career; And To Provide That A Nonresident During A Specified Period May Obtain A Lifetime Combination License Under Certain Conditions Which Grants The Same Privileges As A Statewide Combination License. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Veto sustained Yeas-1 Nays-104 HJ-39 | |
2010-06-21 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-06-15 | Ratified R 337 | |
2010-06-02 | Ordered enrolled for ratification HJ-56 | |
2010-06-02 | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0 HJ-53 | |
2010-06-02 | Conference report received and adopted HJ-53 | |
2010-06-01 | Conference report received and adopted SJ-87 | |
2010-06-01 | Conference committee appointed Reps. Umphlett, Hodges, and M.A. Pitts HJ-5 | |
2010-05-27 | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Land, Knotts, and S. Martin SJ-60 | |
2010-05-25 | Roll call Yeas-3 Nays-95 HJ-114 | |
2010-05-25 | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment HJ-114 | |
2010-05-19 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-47 | |
2010-05-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-05-18 | Read second time SJ-17 | |
2010-05-18 | Amended SJ-17 | |
2010-05-05 | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry SJ-15 | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry SJ-7 | |
2010-03-10 | Introduced and read first time SJ-7 | |
2010-03-10 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-10 | |
2010-03-09 | Read second time HJ-24 | |
2010-03-04 | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-5 | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-7 | |
2009-04-29 | Introduced and read first time HJ-7 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3975&session=118 |