SC H4118 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, Relating To Board Of Examiners For Licensure Of Professional Counselors And Marital And Family Therapists, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4862, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Professional Counselors and Marital and Family Therapists, Board of Examiners for Licensure (D. No. 4862)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 29 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-1 |
2019-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0460 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry