SC S0460 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, Relating To Board Of Examiners For Licensure Of Professional Counselors And Marital And Family Therapists, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4862, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Professional Counselors and Marital and Family Therapists, Board of Examiners for Licensure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0518 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Recommitted to Committee on Education
H4118 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
H4118 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry