SC H4412 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 939 Of 1954, As Amended, Relating To The Powers And Duties Of The Inman-campobello Water District Commission, So As To Permit The Commission To Become A Member And Participate In A Joint Agency Or Authority Organized Under The Laws Of An Adjoining State. - Ratified Title
Title
Inman-Campobello Water District
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | Act No. 99 | |
2023-07-06 | Effective date 05/16/23 | |
2023-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Ratified R 61 | |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Unanimous consent for second and third readings on next two consecutive legislative days |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2023-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-02 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Spartanburg Delegation |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to Spartanburg Delegation |
2023-05-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |