SC H4579 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence SJ-37
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence SJ-37
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO REQUEST THAT THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION NAME THE INTERSECTION OF UNITED STATES HIGHWAYS 76 AND 378 WITH LOWER RICHLAND BOULEVARD IN RICHLAND COUNTY "BETTY AND SAM MCGREGOR INTERSECTION" AND ERECT APPROPRIATE MARKERS OR SIGNS AT THIS INTERSECTION THAT CONTAIN THE WORDS "BETTY AND SAM MCGREGOR INTERSECTION BETTY - 2009 SOUTH CAROLINA AND NATIONAL MOTHER OF THE YEAR".
Title
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Of United States Highways 76 And 378 With Lower Richland Boulevard In Richland County "betty And Sam Mcgregor Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Intersection That Contain The Words "betty And Sam Mcgregor Intersection Betty - 2009 South Carolina And National Mother Of The Year".
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Bales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence SJ-37 | |
2010-05-11 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation SJ-4 | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-21 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced SJ-21 | |
2010-02-25 | Adopted, sent to Senate HJ-32 | |
2010-02-25 | Amended HJ-32 | |
2010-02-24 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-98 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-208 | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced HJ-208 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4579&session=118 |