SC H4579 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - Committee Amendment Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - Committee Amendment Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Replace The Term "lieutenant Governor" With "president Of The Senate".
Title
Governor and Lieutenant Governor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Hutto, Massey |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-02 | House | Amended |
2016-01-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-01-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-01-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.J.McLeod |
2016-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-12-10 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 17 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 23 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 3 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 3 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 3 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 9 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 11 | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 11 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 17 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |