SC H4944 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Act No. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Act No. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-136-140, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Meetings Of The Coastal Carolina University Board Of Trustees, So As To Provide Mandatory Notice Of Board Meetings Must Be Sent Either Electronically Or Through The United States Mail To Each Trustee Not Less Than Five Days Before Each Meeting. - Ratified Title
Title
Coastal Carolina University
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Act No. 130 | |
2022-04-07 | Effective date 04/04/22 | |
2022-04-04 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-03-29 | Ratified R 138 | |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-02-16 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |