SC H4956 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, So As To Enact The "south Carolina Conservation Enhancement Act"; To Amend Section 12-24-90, Relating To The Deed Recording Fee, So As To Require A Portion Of The Fee To Be Credited To The South Carolina Conservation Bank Trust Fund; And To Amend Section 48-59-40, As Amended, Relating To The Board Of The South Carolina Conservation Bank, So As To Add Additional Members To The Board.
Title
SC Conservation Enhancement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox |
2022-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning, M.M.Smith |
2022-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2022-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, Ligon, Wetmore |
2022-02-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Finlay, Carter, Huggins, Erickson |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1039 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Scrivener's error corrected