SC H5209 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Criteria Applicable To Certain Counties In Order For Them To Place The Question Of Imposing This Sales And Use Tax On A Referendum Ballot.
Title
Educational capital improvements sales and use tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Committed to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S1224 (Similar To) 2016-04-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S1233 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Act No. 182
S1233 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Act No. 182