SC H5231 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Act No. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Act No. 263
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Distribution Of Revenue Generated From The Sale Of Recreational And Commercial Marine Licenses, Permits, And Tags
Title
Hunting and fishing
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Pitts [R] | Rep. John West [R] | Rep. Brian White [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 2 N: 93 NV: 24 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 2 N: 93 NV: 24 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Act No. 263 | |
2018-07-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-06-29 | Ratified R 294 | |
2018-06-28 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2018-06-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2018-06-28 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2018-05-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Pitts, Hixon, Atkinson |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Campsen, McElveen, Talley |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-2 Nays-93 |
2018-05-10 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-1 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2018-04-11 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |