SC S0052 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Amendment To Section 7, Article Vi Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Relating To The Constitutional Officers Of This State, To Delete The Adjutant General From The List Of State Officers Which The Constitution Requires To Be Elected And Provide That The Adjutant General Must Be Appointed By The Governor Upon The Advice And Consent Of The Senate For A Term Coterminous With The Governor Upon The Expiration Of The Term Of The Adjutant General Serving In Office On The Date Of The Ratification Of This Provision.
Title
Adjutant General
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0054 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0132 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0173 (Similar To) 2013-03-21 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0170 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3541 (Similar To) 2014-09-08 - Act No. 297
S0444 (Similar To) 2013-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0467 (Similar To) 2013-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0132 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0173 (Similar To) 2013-03-21 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0170 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3541 (Similar To) 2014-09-08 - Act No. 297
S0444 (Similar To) 2013-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0467 (Similar To) 2013-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0052&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/52_20121213.htm |