SC S0061 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allow Employees And Retirees, And Their Dependents, Of Any Political Subdivision Of The State To Participate In The State Health Plan
Title
State health plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 43 | |
2017-05-25 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 64 | |
2017-05-10 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-04 | House | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3600 (Similar To) 2017-01-31 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means