SC S0082 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit The Use Of Public Funds To Employ Or Contract With A Person Whose Activities Include Those Related To Lobbying And To Provide Exceptions.
Title
Public funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-01 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3175 (Similar To) 2011-01-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Viers
S0259 (Similar To) 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
H4081 (Similar To) 2011-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0259 (Similar To) 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
H4081 (Similar To) 2011-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0082&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/82_20101201.htm |