SC S0082 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 15-78-120 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Limitations On Liability, To Increase The Limits From A Loss To One Person Arising From A Single Occurrence To One Million Dollars, To Increase The Total Limits From A Loss Arising Out Of A Single Occurrence To Two Million Dollars, And To Require The Limits Be Annually Adjusted In Accordance With The Consumer Price Index.
Title
Liability limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-30 Nays-9 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-02-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Young, Sabb, Senn, Talley |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |