SC S0094 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Climer, McLeod
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Climer, McLeod
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Factors For The Court To Consider When Determining The Existence Of Changed Circumstances; To Provide That Retirement By The Supporting Spouse Is Sufficient Grounds To Warrant A Hearing, If So Moved By A Party, To Evaluate Whether Alimony Should Be Modified Or Terminated In Amount Or Term And To Provide Factors For The Court To Consider; And To Provide That Payment Of Alimony For A Period That Exceeds The Duration Of Marriage Constitutes Sufficient Grounds For The Court To Modify, Terminate, Or Establish A Fixed Duration Of Time For Any Further Payment Obligation, If Supported By The Evidence Presented.
Title
Modification, confirmation and termination of alimony
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Climer, McLeod |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0093 (Similar To) 2017-02-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Climer, McLeod
H3122 (Similar To) 2017-01-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin
H3122 (Similar To) 2017-01-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0094&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/94_20161213.htm |