SC S0103 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 22-3-10, Relating To The Civil Jurisdiction Of The Magistrates Court, So As To Increase The Civil Jurisdiction From Seven Thousand Five Hundred Dollars To Fifteen Thousand Dollars.
Title
Increase Magistrate Civil Jurisdiction to $15,000
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0050 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Scrivener's error corrected
H4142 (Similar To) 2023-03-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4142 (Similar To) 2023-03-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary