SC S0275 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Brewpub That Becomes A Brewery Must Relinquish Its Brewpub Permit In Accordance With The Requirements Of Section 61-4-1515
Title
Breweries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 50 | |
2017-05-26 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 71 | |
2017-05-10 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-83 Nays-0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-1 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Shealy (ch), Hutto, Senn |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3851 (Similar To) 2018-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton