SC H3851 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Brewery Brewing And Selling Beer On Its Licensed Premises In This State May Apply For A Permit To Sell Alcoholic Liquor By The Drink For Consumption Within A Specified Area Under Certain Conditions, And To Provide That A Brewpub May Apply For A Brewery Permit Provided That It Surrenders Its Brewpub Permit At The Time The Brewery Permit Is Issued.
Title
Breweries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2017-04-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0275 (Similar To) 2017-05-31 - Act No. 50
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3851&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3851_20170223.htm |