SC S0282 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Coleman, Gregory
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Coleman, Gregory
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establish The Cdl Driver Employment Protection Act Which Provides That Civil Liability Claims Made Against An Employer Of A Person Who Holds A Valid Commercial Driver's License Based On Any Theory Of Negligent Hiring, Training, Retention, Or Entrustment Must Be Considered In The Second Phase Of A Bifurcated Trial Pursuant To Section 15-32-520(e), If There Is Evidence To Support An Award Of Punitive Damages, But Punitive Damages May Not Be Awarded Against An Employer Solely On The Basis Of Vicarious Liability; To Amend Section 15-73-10, Relating To Seller Liability In Products Liability Claims, To Prohibit Claims Against Sellers Unless Specified Conditions Are Met; To Repeal Article 5, Chapter 32, Title 15 Relating To Punitive Damages.
Title
Noneconomic damages limit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Coleman, Gregory |
2015-02-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0529 (Similar To) 2015-03-12 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Coleman, Gregory
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 32 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 32 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 32 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 32 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 32 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 35 | 280 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 73 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |