SC S0351 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Act No. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Act No. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The State Budget And Control Board To Transfer Ownership Of The Belton National Guard Armory To The City Of Belton
Title
Belton National Guard Armory
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - House - House: Adopt Resolution (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | Act No. 116 | |
2013-04-03 | Effective date 10/01/13 | |
2013-03-22 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-03-21 | Ratified R 10 | |
2013-03-07 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2013-03-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2013-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3488 (Similar To) 2013-02-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance