SC H3488 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The State Budget And Control Board To Transfer Ownership Of The Belton National Guard Armory To The City Of Belton.
Title
Belton National Guard Armory
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - House: Adopt Joint Resolution (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-02-08 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-02-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2013-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-7-13 |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0351 (Similar To) 2013-08-13 - Act No. 116