SC S0367 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Provisions That Regulate The Operation Of Various Types Of Watercraft, To Increase The Distance Between A Watercraft And Another Object Near Which A Watercraft May Be Operated In Excess Of Idle Speed, And To Provide That Certain Watercraft May Not Be Operated Upon The Intracoastal Waterway In Excess Of Idle Speed Within Fifty Feet Of Certain Objects.
Title
Watercraft
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Continued |
2018-05-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-2-18 |
2018-02-27 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-26-18 |
2018-01-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-22-18 |
2017-05-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-1-17 |
2017-05-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-10-17 |
2017-05-03 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-3 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3577 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCravy