SC S0402 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Disability Licenses For Hunting And Fishing, To Allow Residents Receiving Benefits From A State Retirement System To Obtain A Three Year Combination Or Fishing License At No Cost.
Title
Hunting and fishing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |