SC S0578 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Act No. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Act No. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The State General Obligation Economic Development Bond Act, To Provide For The Issuance Of General Obligation Debt To Support An Enhanced Economic Development Project, To Make Findings That The Issuance Of The Bonded Indebtedness Supports A Public Purpose And Is In The Best Interest Of The State, To Provide Qualifying Investment And Job Creation Criteria, And To Provide For The Terms, Conditions, And Requirements For The Issuance Of The Bonded Indebtedness
Title
Boeing Incentive Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Act No. 13 | |
2013-04-29 | Effective date 04/23/13 | |
2013-04-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-04-18 | Ratified R 19 | |
2013-04-18 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2013-04-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2013-04-17 | House | Read second time |
2013-04-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-4 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-6 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3815 (Similar To) 2013-04-23 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry